MA H2405 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 11-3)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-05-01 - Hearing scheduled for 05/07/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in B-2
Pending: Joint Revenue Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Relative to the sales tax on mobile telecommunications devices purchased with a service contract. Revenue.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to the bundled cell phone taxation

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-01JointHearing scheduled for 05/07/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in B-2
2019-01-22SenateSenate concurred
2019-01-22HouseReferred to the Joint Committee on Revenue

Same As/Similar To

H2398 (Similar To) 2019-01-22 - Senate concurred
H2596 (Similar To) 2019-05-01 - Hearing scheduled for 05/07/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in B-2
H2478 (Similar To) 2019-05-01 - Hearing scheduled for 05/07/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in B-2
S1641 (Similar To) 2019-05-01 - Hearing scheduled for 05/07/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in B-2
H2495 (Similar To) 2019-05-01 - Hearing scheduled for 05/07/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in B-2
H2570 (Similar To) 2019-05-01 - Hearing scheduled for 05/07/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in B-2
H3793 (Similar To) 2019-06-10 - Committee of conference appointed (Boncore-Brownsberger-Tran), in concurrence
H3899 (Similar To) 2019-06-13 - Resolutions adopted

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback