MA H2404 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H5128
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-11-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H5128
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-11-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H5128
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to provide an income tax credit for expenditures for the design, construction, repair or replacement of failed cesspool or septic systems. Revenue.
Title
Relative to expanding the septic system tax credit
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-11-19 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H5128 |
2019-07-17 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 07/23/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in B-2 |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2019-01-22 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Revenue |
Same As/Similar To
H2561 (Similar To) 2020-11-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H5080
H2449 (Similar To) 2020-11-04 - Accompanied a study order, see H5031
H2492 (Similar To) 2020-11-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H5128
H2647 (Similar To) 2020-03-04 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4467
H2445 (Similar To) 2020-11-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H5128
H2412 (Similar To) 2020-10-15 - Accompanied a study order, see H5040
H2578 (Similar To) 2020-11-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H5080
S1612 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a study order, see S2549
H5128 (Replaced by) 2020-11-19 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
H2449 (Similar To) 2020-11-04 - Accompanied a study order, see H5031
H2492 (Similar To) 2020-11-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H5128
H2647 (Similar To) 2020-03-04 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4467
H2445 (Similar To) 2020-11-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H5128
H2412 (Similar To) 2020-10-15 - Accompanied a study order, see H5040
H2578 (Similar To) 2020-11-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H5080
S1612 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a study order, see S2549
H5128 (Replaced by) 2020-11-19 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H2404 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H2404.pdf |