MA H2400 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to classify racism as a public health crisis. Public Health.
Title
Regarding racism as a public health crisis
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-01-03 | House | No further action taken |
2022-05-02 | House | Committee recommended bill ought to pass and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means |
2021-12-02 | House | Reported favorably by committee and referred to the Joint Committee on Health Care Financing |
2021-10-15 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 10/28/2021 from 09:00 AM-03:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2021-03-29 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Public Health |
Same As/Similar To
S1001 (Similar To) 2022-02-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2665
H2490 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S791 (Similar To) 2022-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see S2917
S2483 (Similar To) 2022-02-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2692
S2540 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S216 (Similar To) 2022-02-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2666
S1461 (Similar To) 2022-04-04 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1280 (Similar To) 2022-07-13 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1410 (Similar To) 2022-02-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2692
S1025 (Similar To) 2022-02-28 - Accompanied H1702
S1382 (Similar To) 2021-12-02 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2282 (Similar To) 2021-09-27 - Amendment #1 () adopted
H2098 (Similar To) 2022-09-06 - Accompanied a study order, see H5194
H2490 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S791 (Similar To) 2022-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see S2917
S2483 (Similar To) 2022-02-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2692
S2540 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S216 (Similar To) 2022-02-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2666
S1461 (Similar To) 2022-04-04 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1280 (Similar To) 2022-07-13 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1410 (Similar To) 2022-02-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2692
S1025 (Similar To) 2022-02-28 - Accompanied H1702
S1382 (Similar To) 2021-12-02 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2282 (Similar To) 2021-09-27 - Amendment #1 () adopted
H2098 (Similar To) 2022-09-06 - Accompanied a study order, see H5194
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H2400 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H2400.pdf |