MA H240 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H5089
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 26-2)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-07-26 - Accompanied a new draft, see H5089
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-07-26 - Accompanied a new draft, see H5089
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to individuals with intellectual or developmental disabilities. Children, Families and Persons with Disabilities.
Title
Relative to individuals with intellectual or developmental disabilities
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-07-26 | House | Accompanied a new draft, see H5089 |
2022-07-07 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2022-06-06 | House | Reporting date extended to Sunday July 31, 2022, pending concurrence |
2022-06-02 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2022-04-14 | House | Reporting date extended to Friday June 10, 2022, pending concurrence |
2022-03-24 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2022-01-27 | House | Reporting date extended to Monday May 2, 2022, pending concurrence |
2021-10-18 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 10/29/2021 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2021-03-29 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Children, Families and Persons with Disabilities |
Same As/Similar To
H2279 (Similar To) 2022-01-10 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2615
S1103 (Similar To) 2022-02-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2665
H5089 (Replaced by) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H2531 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H196 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S1103 (Similar To) 2022-02-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2665
H5089 (Replaced by) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H2531 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H196 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H240 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H240.pdf |