MA H2384 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-4)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-04-29 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation to include forensic scientists employed at the Massachusetts State Police Crime Laboratory in Group 2 of the contributory retirement system for public employees. Public Service.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to employees of the Commonwealth who are required to respond to crime scenes

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-04-29HouseBill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
2020-02-06SenateSenate concurred
2020-02-03HouseReporting date extended to Wednesday April 22, 2020, pending concurrence
2019-10-28JointHearing scheduled for 11/12/2019 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-2
2019-01-22SenateSenate concurred
2019-01-22HouseReferred to the Joint Committee on Public Service

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback