MA H2377 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court

Note: Legislation replaced by H4722

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 30-12)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-05-20 - Accompanied a study order, see H4722
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Relative to veterans’ preference hiring practices. Public Service.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Protecting veterans’ preference in hiring practices

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-05-20HouseAccompanied a study order, see H4722
2019-10-11JointHearing scheduled for 10/21/2019 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in A-1
2019-01-22SenateSenate concurred
2019-01-22HouseReferred to the Joint Committee on Public Service

Same As/Similar To

S1097 (Similar To) 2020-05-04 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1069 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a study order, see S2548
H3811 (Similar To) 2020-05-20 - Accompanied a study order, see H4722
H4722 (Replaced by) 2020-05-20 - Reported, in part, by H2169

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback