MA H2376 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-04-14 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-04-14 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to providing credible service for retirement purposes for VISTA volunteers. Public Service.
Title
Relative to credible service for VISTA volunteers
Sponsors
Rep. David Muradian [R] | Sen. Ryan Fattman [R] | Rep. Susannah Whipps Lee [I] | Rep. James Dwyer [D] |
Rep. Kimberly Ferguson [R] | Rep. Tricia Farley-Bouvier [D] | Rep. Fred Barrows [R] | Rep. Jonathan Hecht [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-14 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means |
2015-10-06 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 10/20/2015 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in 437 |
2015-01-20 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2015-01-20 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Public Service |
Same As/Similar To
H2626 (Similar To) 2016-09-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H4639
H2625 (Similar To) 2016-09-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H4639
H2377 (Similar To) 2016-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4367
H2627 (Similar To) 2016-09-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H4639
H2795 (Similar To) 2016-03-10 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H2625 (Similar To) 2016-09-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H4639
H2377 (Similar To) 2016-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4367
H2627 (Similar To) 2016-09-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H4639
H2795 (Similar To) 2016-03-10 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H2376 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H2376.pdf |