MA H2329 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4367
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4367
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4367
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to further regulate the attendance by police officers at police association executive board meetings. Public Service.
Title
To further regulate the attendance by police officers at police association executive board meeting
Sponsors
Rep. Paul Heroux [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-09 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4367 |
2015-11-03 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 11/10/2015 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in A-1 |
2015-01-20 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2015-01-20 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Public Service |
Same As/Similar To
H4367 (Replaced by) 2016-06-09 - Reported, in part, by H4012
H1360 (Similar To) 2016-10-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4706
H868 (Similar To) 2016-03-28 - Accompanied a study order, see H4111
H398 (Similar To) 2016-08-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H4591
H2530 (Similar To) 2016-09-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H4639
H1361 (Similar To) 2016-10-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4706
H1360 (Similar To) 2016-10-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4706
H868 (Similar To) 2016-03-28 - Accompanied a study order, see H4111
H398 (Similar To) 2016-08-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H4591
H2530 (Similar To) 2016-09-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H4639
H1361 (Similar To) 2016-10-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4706
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H2329 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H2329.pdf |