MA H2328 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H5202
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-3)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-09-06 - Accompanied a study order, see H5202
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-09-06 - Accompanied a study order, see H5202
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to informed consent for concurrent surgical procedures. Public Health.
Title
Relative to informed consent for concurrent surgical procedures
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-09-06 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H5202 |
2022-02-17 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2022-02-17 | House | Reporting date extended to Saturday December 31, 2022, pending concurrence |
2021-10-15 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 10/28/2021 from 09:00 AM-03:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2021-03-29 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Public Health |
Same As/Similar To
H2405 (Similar To) 2022-09-06 - Accompanied a study order, see H5035
H2093 (Similar To) 2022-09-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H5225
S1383 (Similar To) 2021-12-02 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4270
H5202 (Replaced by) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H2093 (Similar To) 2022-09-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H5225
S1383 (Similar To) 2021-12-02 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4270
H5202 (Replaced by) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H2328 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H2328.pdf |