MA H2325 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 27-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-06-13 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation to maximize out-of-cell time and opportunities for incarcerated people to attend education, training, employment, and other programs. Public Safety and Homeland Security.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Related to rehabilitation, re-entry, and human rights for incarcerated persons

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2024-06-13HouseBill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
2024-06-10SenateSenate concurred
2024-05-13HouseReporting date extended to Monday June 10, 2024, pending concurrence
2024-04-25SenateSenate concurred
2024-04-11HouseReporting date extended to Wednesday May 8, 2024, pending concurrence
2024-03-25SenateSenate concurred
2024-02-12HouseReporting date extended to Monday April 8, 2024, pending concurrence
2024-01-16JointHearing scheduled for 01/23/2024 from 11:00 AM-05:00 PM in B-2
2023-02-16SenateSenate concurred
2023-02-16HouseReferred to the Joint Committee on Public Safety and Homeland Security

Same As/Similar To

H2314 (Similar To) 2024-05-16 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H2372 (Similar To) 2024-05-22 - Reported favorably by committee and referred to the Joint Committee on Health Care Financing
H1362 (Similar To) 2024-03-14 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S2675 (Similar To) 2024-04-01 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H4803 (Similar To) 2024-06-27 - Pending new draft of H2333

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback