MA H2311 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court

Note: Legislation replaced by H4722

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 26-2)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-05-20 - Accompanied a study order, see H4722
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Relative to credible service for school nurses. Public Service.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to credible service for school nurses

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-05-20HouseAccompanied a study order, see H4722
2019-05-21JointHearing scheduled for 05/29/2019 from 11:00 AM-01:00 PM in B-2
2019-01-22SenateSenate concurred
2019-01-22HouseReferred to the Joint Committee on Public Service

Same As/Similar To

H2268 (Similar To) 2020-05-20 - Accompanied a study order, see H4722
H2309 (Similar To) 2020-05-20 - Accompanied a study order, see H4722
H2370 (Similar To) 2020-05-20 - Accompanied a study order, see H4722
H52 (Similar To) 2019-12-30 - Read; and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H2160 (Similar To) 2020-05-20 - Accompanied a study order, see H4722
H2165 (Similar To) 2020-05-20 - Accompanied a study order, see H4722
H2351 (Similar To) 2020-05-20 - Accompanied a study order, see H4722
S1581 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2545
H2159 (Similar To) 2020-05-20 - Accompanied a study order, see H4722
S2257 (Similar To) 2020-05-14 - Senate concurred
H3868 (Similar To) 2019-11-19 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H4722 (Replaced by) 2020-05-20 - Reported, in part, by H2169

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback