MA H2302 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court

Note: Legislation replaced by H4722

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 12-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-05-20 - Accompanied a study order, see H4722
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation to require any unused vacation time that is not eligible to be carried over to the following year be converted to a sick leave bank administered by individual state agencies. Public Service.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to a universal sick leave bank policy

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-05-20HouseAccompanied a study order, see H4722
2019-10-11JointHearing scheduled for 10/21/2019 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in A-1
2019-01-22SenateSenate concurred
2019-01-22HouseReferred to the Joint Committee on Public Service

Same As/Similar To

S1864 (Similar To) 2020-02-27 - Accompanied a study order, see S2569
H2706 (Similar To) 2020-02-13 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H2376 (Similar To) 2019-06-25 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 24 of the Acts of 2019
S1907 (Similar To) 2020-02-27 - Accompanied a study order, see S2569
H5 (Similar To) 2019-07-24 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S2209 (Similar To) 2019-06-07 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 17 of the Acts of 2019
H3697 (Similar To) 2019-06-12 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 18 of the Acts of 2019
H3740 (Similar To) 2019-06-20 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 23 of the Acts of 2019
H3816 (Similar To) 2019-06-17 - Read, rules suspended, read second and ordered to a third reading
H3849 (Similar To) 2019-08-07 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 56 of the Acts of 2019
H3862 (Similar To) 2019-06-20 - Read, rules suspended, read second and ordered to a third reading
H3913 (Similar To) 2019-07-03 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 33 of the Acts of 2019
H3952 (Similar To) 2019-08-08 - Read, rules suspended, read second and ordered to a third reading
S2301 (Similar To) 2019-08-13 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 60 of the Acts of 2019
H4064 (Similar To) 2019-10-29 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 97 of the Acts of 2019
H4151 (Similar To) 2019-11-18 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 116 of the Acts of 2019
H4156 (Similar To) 2019-11-12 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 108 of the Acts of 2019
S2415 (Similar To) 2020-01-14 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 4 of the Acts of 2020
H4237 (Similar To) 2020-01-22 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 8 of the Acts of 2020
S2437 (Similar To) 2020-01-29 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 15 of the Acts of 2020
S2442 (Similar To) 2020-01-02 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H4722 (Replaced by) 2020-05-20 - Reported, in part, by H2169

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback