MA H2297 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-06-13 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation to establish a violence prevention trust fund. Public Safety and Homeland Security.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to violence prevention trust fund

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2024-06-13HouseBill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
2024-06-10SenateSenate concurred
2024-05-13HouseReporting date extended to Monday June 10, 2024, pending concurrence
2024-04-25SenateSenate concurred
2024-04-11HouseReporting date extended to Wednesday May 8, 2024, pending concurrence
2024-03-25SenateSenate concurred
2024-02-12HouseReporting date extended to Monday April 8, 2024, pending concurrence
2023-09-06JointHearing rescheduled to 09/13/2023 from 12:00 PM-05:00 PM in B-1
2023-09-06JointHearing rescheduled to 09/13/2023 from 12:00 PM-05:00 PM in B-2
2023-02-16SenateSenate concurred
2023-02-16HouseReferred to the Joint Committee on Public Safety and Homeland Security

Same As/Similar To

H1377 (Similar To) 2024-03-14 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H470 (Similar To) 2024-02-26 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4419
H3203 (Similar To) 2024-07-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H4778
H3953 (Similar To) 2024-06-03 - Accompanied a study order, see H4705

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback