MA H2289 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2022-02-17 - Senate concurred
Pending: Joint Public Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

By Mr. Galvin of Canton, a petition of William C. Galvin and others that the Department of Public Health be authorized to establish a Parkinson's disease public information and education program. Public Health.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to Parkinson's Disease public awareness and education

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2022-02-17SenateSenate concurred
2022-02-17HouseReporting date extended to Saturday December 31, 2022, pending concurrence
2021-11-02JointHearing scheduled for 11/10/2021 from 09:00 AM-03:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
2021-03-29SenateSenate concurred
2021-03-29HouseReferred to the Joint Committee on Public Health

Same As/Similar To

S1001 (Similar To) 2022-02-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2665
S1421 (Similar To) 2022-03-17 - Accompanied a study order, see S2772
H2490 (Similar To) 2022-03-17 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S216 (Similar To) 2022-02-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2666
S2540 (Similar To) 2021-09-27 - Read; and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S1460 (Similar To) 2022-02-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2692
S1280 (Similar To) 2022-06-02 - Senate concurred
S2282 (Similar To) 2021-09-27 - Amendment #1 () adopted
S1586 (Similar To) 2022-03-21 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1434 (Similar To) 2022-02-22 - House concurred

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback