MA H2289 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4722
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-05-20 - Accompanied a study order, see H4722
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-05-20 - Accompanied a study order, see H4722
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation relative to the cost of living adjustment for local retirees. Public Service.
Title
Relative to the cost of living adjustment for local retirees
Sponsors
Rep. Natalie Higgins [D] | Rep. Mary Keefe [D] | Rep. Jack Lewis [D] | Rep. Peter Capano [D] |
Rep. Carlos Gonzalez [D] | Rep. James Hawkins [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-20 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4722 |
2019-09-12 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 09/26/2019 from 11:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-1 |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2019-01-22 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Public Service |
Same As/Similar To
H2232 (Similar To) 2020-05-20 - Accompanied a study order, see H4722
H2214 (Similar To) 2020-05-20 - Accompanied a study order, see H4722
H2158 (Similar To) 2020-05-20 - Accompanied a study order, see H4722
S1576 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2545
S1487 (Similar To) 2020-07-02 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2798
H4722 (Replaced by) 2020-05-20 - Reported, in part, by H2169
H2214 (Similar To) 2020-05-20 - Accompanied a study order, see H4722
H2158 (Similar To) 2020-05-20 - Accompanied a study order, see H4722
S1576 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2545
S1487 (Similar To) 2020-07-02 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2798
H4722 (Replaced by) 2020-05-20 - Reported, in part, by H2169
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H2289 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H2289.pdf |