MA H2275 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court

Note: Legislation replaced by H4722

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 37-4)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-05-20 - Accompanied a study order, see H4722
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Relative to residency requirements for certain public safety officials in cities and towns. Public Service.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to residency

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-05-20HouseAccompanied a study order, see H4722
2019-10-11JointHearing scheduled for 10/21/2019 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in A-1
2019-01-22SenateSenate concurred
2019-01-22HouseReferred to the Joint Committee on Public Service

Same As/Similar To

H2668 (Similar To) 2019-07-18 - Hearing scheduled for 07/26/2019 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in A-1
H2961 (Similar To) 2019-12-23 - Hearing scheduled for 01/02/2020 from 10:00 AM-04:00 PM in A-1
H1826 (Similar To) 2020-01-13 - Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting for a second reading
H290 (Similar To) 2019-06-04 - Hearing scheduled for 06/10/2019 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in A-2
H2559 (Similar To) 2020-02-27 - Accompanied H2658
S1513 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2545
H341 (Similar To) 2019-06-26 - Hearing scheduled for 07/01/2019 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in A-2
S216 (Similar To) 2020-05-04 - Reporting date extended to Monday June 1, 2020, pending concurrence
H254 (Similar To) 2019-06-26 - Hearing scheduled for 07/01/2019 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in A-2
H1792 (Similar To) 2020-01-13 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4289
H1393 (Similar To) 2019-06-07 - Hearing scheduled for 06/17/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in Gardner Auditorium
H4063 (Similar To) 2020-02-13 - Senate concurred
H4722 (Replaced by) 2020-05-20 - Reported, in part, by H2169

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback