MA H2274 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-11-19 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Relative to retirement benefits for certain veterans. Public Service.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to veteran retirement benefits

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-11-19HouseBill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
2019-10-11JointHearing scheduled for 10/21/2019 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in A-1
2019-01-22SenateSenate concurred
2019-01-22HouseReferred to the Joint Committee on Public Service

Same As/Similar To

H2395 (Similar To) 2019-09-18 - Hearing scheduled for 09/24/2019 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in B-2
H2398 (Similar To) 2019-09-18 - Hearing scheduled for 09/24/2019 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in B-2
H2401 (Similar To) 2019-09-18 - Hearing scheduled for 09/24/2019 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in B-2
H2268 (Similar To) 2019-07-03 - Hearing scheduled for 07/09/2019 from 01:00 PM-03:00 PM in B-2
H2541 (Similar To) 2019-09-18 - Hearing scheduled for 09/24/2019 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in B-2
H3214 (Similar To) 2019-06-03 - Hearing scheduled for 06/11/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-1
H3044 (Similar To) 2019-01-22 - Senate concurred
H3215 (Similar To) 2019-06-03 - Hearing scheduled for 06/11/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-1
H3246 (Similar To) 2019-06-03 - Hearing scheduled for 06/11/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-1
H2386 (Similar To) 2019-10-11 - Hearing scheduled for 10/21/2019 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in A-1
S2166 (Similar To) 2019-09-16 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2333 (Similar To) 2019-09-09 - House concurred
S2337 (Similar To) 2019-10-11 - Hearing scheduled for 10/21/2019 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in A-1

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback