MA H2268 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-06-09 - Hearing scheduled for 06/22/2021 from 10:00 AM-02:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
Pending: Joint Public Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-06-09 - Hearing scheduled for 06/22/2021 from 10:00 AM-02:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
Pending: Joint Public Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
By Ms. Domb of Amherst, a petition of Mindy Domb, Patricia A. Duffy and David Allen Robertson that the Department of Public Health and the Department of Elementary and Secondary Education implement a healthy and green public schools initiative. Public Health.
Title
For healthy and green public schools
Sponsors
Rep. Mindy Domb [D] | Rep. Patricia Duffy [D] | Rep. David Robertson [D] | Rep. Tommy Vitolo [D] |
Rep. Christina Minicucci [D] | Rep. Jack Lewis [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-09 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 06/22/2021 from 10:00 AM-02:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2021-03-29 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Public Health |
Same As/Similar To
S1382 (Similar To) 2021-12-02 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H2268 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H2268.pdf |