MA H2266 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4874
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-2)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-08-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4874
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-08-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4874
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to establish a prison mitigation fund for cities and towns hosting Department of Correction facilities. The Judiciary.
Title
Relative to prison mitigation
Sponsors
Rep. Angelo D'Emilia [R] | Sen. Richard Ross [R] | Rep. Shawn Dooley [R] | Rep. Sheila Harrington [R] |
Rep. Kimberly Ferguson [R] | Rep. Susan Gifford [R] | Rep. Carlos Gonzalez [D] | Sen. Michael Moore [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-08-09 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4874 |
2017-06-12 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 06/19/2017 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in Gardner Auditorium |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2017-01-23 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on The Judiciary |
Same As/Similar To
H662 (Similar To) 2018-07-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H4740
H1758 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4651
S1646 (Similar To) 2018-04-30 - Accompanied a study order, see S2497
H388 (Similar To) 2018-02-28 - Accompanied a study order, see H4252
H1082 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H1107 (Similar To) 2018-06-11 - Accompanied a study order, see H4590
S1368 (Similar To) 2017-06-26 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H1777 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4651
H3927 (Similar To) 2018-05-23 - Accompanied a study order, see H4529
S2332 (Similar To) 2018-03-15 - Reprinted as amended, see S2347
H4874 (Replaced by) 2018-08-09 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
H1758 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4651
S1646 (Similar To) 2018-04-30 - Accompanied a study order, see S2497
H388 (Similar To) 2018-02-28 - Accompanied a study order, see H4252
H1082 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H1107 (Similar To) 2018-06-11 - Accompanied a study order, see H4590
S1368 (Similar To) 2017-06-26 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H1777 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4651
H3927 (Similar To) 2018-05-23 - Accompanied a study order, see H4529
S2332 (Similar To) 2018-03-15 - Reprinted as amended, see S2347
H4874 (Replaced by) 2018-08-09 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H2266 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H2266.pdf |