MA H2262 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4874
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-08-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4874
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-08-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4874
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
By Ms. Cronin of Easton, a petition of Claire D. Cronin and others establishing criminal responsibility for motor vehicle operators who depart after knowingly colliding with or otherwise causing injury to any person on private property. The Judiciary.
Title
Establishing criminal responsibility for motor vehicle “hit and runs” on private property
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-08-09 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4874 |
2017-10-17 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 10/24/2017 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in B-1 |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2017-01-23 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on The Judiciary |
Same As/Similar To
H2283 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4874
H747 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4874
H1856 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H731 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4874
H947 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4874
H3117 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4874
H4874 (Replaced by) 2018-08-09 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
H747 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4874
H1856 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H731 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4874
H947 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4874
H3117 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4874
H4874 (Replaced by) 2018-08-09 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H2262 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H2262.pdf |