MA H2252 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4565
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-22 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4565
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-22 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4565
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to promoting best practices in youth athletic coaching. Public Health.
Title
Promoting best practices in youth athletic coaching
Sponsors
Rep. Ted Philips [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-22 | House | Accompanied a new draft, see H4565 |
2024-04-16 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2024-02-12 | House | Reporting date extended to Tuesday December 31, 2024, pending concurrence |
2023-11-03 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 11/15/2023 from 09:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-2 |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2023-02-16 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Public Health |
Same As/Similar To
H2004 (Similar To) 2024-06-06 - Accompanied a study order, see H4712
H220 (Similar To) 2024-09-05 - Accompanied a study order, see H4711
H2201 (Similar To) 2024-07-01 - Accompanied a study order, see H4739
S1565 (Similar To) 2024-05-30 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H4565 (Replaced by) 2024-04-22 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H220 (Similar To) 2024-09-05 - Accompanied a study order, see H4711
H2201 (Similar To) 2024-07-01 - Accompanied a study order, see H4739
S1565 (Similar To) 2024-05-30 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H4565 (Replaced by) 2024-04-22 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H2252 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H2252.pdf |