MA H2235 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-05-21 - Hearing scheduled for 06/07/2021 from 10:00 AM-02:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
Pending: Joint Public Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Relative to administering and dispensing controlled substances by certain practitioners. Public Health.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To improve patient access to prescription medication

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-05-21JointHearing scheduled for 06/07/2021 from 10:00 AM-02:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
2021-03-29SenateSenate concurred
2021-03-29HouseReferred to the Joint Committee on Public Health

Same As/Similar To

S806 (Similar To) 2022-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see S2917
H1068 (Similar To) 2021-09-28 - Hearing scheduled for 10/12/2021 from 11:00 AM-04:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
S1487 (Similar To) 2022-02-16 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4466
S808 (Similar To) 2022-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see S2917
H2236 (Similar To) 2021-10-20 - Hearing scheduled for 10/29/2021 from 09:00 AM-03:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
S771 (Similar To) 2022-02-10 - New draft substituted, see S2651

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback