MA H2219 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H5035
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-09-06 - Accompanied a study order, see H5035
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-09-06 - Accompanied a study order, see H5035
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to non-opioid alternatives in pain treatment. Public Health.
Title
Relative to non-opioid alternatives in pain treatment
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-09-06 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H5035 |
2021-10-15 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 10/28/2021 from 09:00 AM-03:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2021-03-29 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Public Health |
Same As/Similar To
S1305 (Similar To) 2022-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see S2919
H2092 (Similar To) 2022-10-13 - Accompanied a study order, see H5350
S687 (Similar To) 2022-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see S2917
H1060 (Similar To) 2022-09-15 - Accompanied a study order, see H5222
H5035 (Replaced by) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H2092 (Similar To) 2022-10-13 - Accompanied a study order, see H5350
S687 (Similar To) 2022-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see S2917
H1060 (Similar To) 2022-09-15 - Accompanied a study order, see H5222
H5035 (Replaced by) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H2219 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H2219.pdf |