MA H2200 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court

Note: Legislation replaced by H16

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 25-1)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-06-06 - Accompanied H16
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Relative to the Massachusetts teachers' retirement system. Public Service.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to the Massachusetts teachers retirement system

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-06HouseAccompanied H16
2019-05-21JointHearing scheduled for 05/29/2019 from 11:00 AM-01:00 PM in B-2
2019-01-22SenateSenate concurred
2019-01-22HouseReferred to the Joint Committee on Public Service

Same As/Similar To

H1744 (Similar To) 2019-01-22 - Senate concurred
H2832 (Similar To) 2019-05-28 - Hearing scheduled for 05/30/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-1
H232 (Similar To) 2019-04-23 - Hearing scheduled for 04/29/2019 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in A-2
H702 (Similar To) 2019-01-22 - Senate concurred
H1098 (Similar To) 2019-01-22 - Senate concurred
H2245 (Similar To) 2019-01-22 - Senate concurred
H1049 (Similar To) 2019-05-30 - Hearing rescheduled to 06/06/2019 from 11:00 AM-03:00 PM in 222
H3181 (Similar To) 2019-01-22 - Senate concurred
H2189 (Similar To) 2019-01-22 - Senate concurred
H879 (Similar To) 2019-03-26 - Hearing scheduled for 04/02/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2
H16 (Replaced by) 2019-06-06 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback