MA H2198 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-4)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2022-01-03 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Relative to municipal natural resource protection bylaws or ordinances and the preservation of wetlands and water resources in certain housing applications. Municipalities and Regional Government.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to the preservation of wetlands and water resources in Chapter 40B applications

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2022-01-03HouseRead second and ordered to a third reading
2022-01-03HouseRules suspended
2022-01-03HouseCommittee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting
2021-12-13HouseBill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling
2021-07-16JointHearing scheduled for 07/27/2021 from 11:00 AM-03:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
2021-03-29SenateSenate concurred
2021-03-29HouseReferred to the Joint Committee on Municipalities and Regional Government

Same As/Similar To

S866 (Similar To) 2022-05-12 - Reporting date extended to Sunday July 31, 2022, pending concurrence

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback