MA H2186 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2022-03-07 - Placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting (under the last sentence of Rule 7A), the question being on acceptance
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation to prohibit cities or towns from failing to enforce federal immigration laws by designating themselves as sanctuary cities and to withhold unrestricted general government aid to cities and towns for non-compliance. Municipalities and Regional Government.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to sanctuary cities and towns

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2022-03-07HousePlaced in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting (under the last sentence of Rule 7A), the question being on acceptance
2022-01-31HouseCommittee recommended ought NOT to pass and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling
2021-10-08JointHearing scheduled for 10/19/2021 from 11:00 AM-03:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
2021-03-29SenateSenate concurred
2021-03-29HouseReferred to the Joint Committee on Municipalities and Regional Government

Same As/Similar To

S1573 (Similar To) 2022-06-28 - Accompanied H2418
S1580 (Similar To) 2022-06-28 - Accompanied H2418

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback