MA H2165 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to authorizing cities and towns to establish reduced maximum tow rates during certain declared emergencies. Municipalities and Regional Government.
Title
Authorizing cities and towns to establish reduced maximum tow rates during certain declared emergencies
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-01-03 | House | No further action taken |
2021-12-23 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2021-12-23 | House | Rules suspended |
2021-12-23 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting |
2021-12-13 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2021-09-21 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 09/28/2021 from 12:00 PM-03:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2021-03-29 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Municipalities and Regional Government |
Same As/Similar To
H3640 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H2170 (Similar To) 2022-06-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H4933
H431 (Similar To) 2022-06-30 - Accompanied a study order, see H4880
S273 (Similar To) 2022-03-03 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S151 (Similar To) 2022-02-22 - Accompanied a study order, see S2709
S1803 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S889 (Similar To) 2022-07-29 - Accompanied a study order, see S3069
H5137 (Similar To) 2022-08-08 - Read; and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
H2170 (Similar To) 2022-06-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H4933
H431 (Similar To) 2022-06-30 - Accompanied a study order, see H4880
S273 (Similar To) 2022-03-03 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S151 (Similar To) 2022-02-22 - Accompanied a study order, see S2709
S1803 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S889 (Similar To) 2022-07-29 - Accompanied a study order, see S3069
H5137 (Similar To) 2022-08-08 - Read; and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H2165 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H2165.pdf |