MA H216 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 26-5-1)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-03-18 - Accompanied S67
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-03-18 - Accompanied S67
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to allowing spouses to serve as caregivers in the MassHealth program for home-based care and services. Children, Families and Persons with Disabilities.
Title
Allowing spouses to serve as caregivers
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-18 | Senate | Accompanied S67 |
2023-10-06 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 10/16/2023 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in B-2 |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2023-02-16 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Children, Families and Persons with Disabilities |
Same As/Similar To
S67 (Similar To) 2024-09-05 - Accompanied a study order, see H5014
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H216 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H216.pdf |