MA H2155 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H5117
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-11-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H5117
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-11-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H5117
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to the availability of personal floatation devices at swimming pools of certain municipal and recreational programs and camps. Public Safety and Homeland Security.
Title
Relative to the availability of personal floatation devices at certain municipal and recreational programs and camps
Sponsors
Rep. Bud Williams [D] | Rep. Carlos Gonzalez [D] | Sen. Liz Miranda [D] | Rep. Jose Tosado [D] |
Rep. Chynah Tyler [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-11-10 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H5117 |
2019-11-01 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 12/17/2019 from 10:00 AM-12:00 PM in A-1 |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2019-01-22 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Public Safety and Homeland Security |
Same As/Similar To
H5117 (Replaced by) 2020-11-10 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H2155 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H2155.pdf |