MA H2150 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on January 2 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-01-02 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 356 of the Acts of 2022
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on January 2 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-01-02 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 356 of the Acts of 2022
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to tax title expense on land taken or sold for nonpayment of taxes. Municipalities and Regional Government.
Title
Relative to tax title expense
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-01-02 | Signed by the Governor, Chapter 356 of the Acts of 2022 | |
2022-12-27 | Senate | Enacted and laid before the Governor |
2022-12-27 | House | Enacted |
2022-12-27 | Senate | Read second, ordered to a third reading, read third (title changed) and passed to be engrossed |
2022-12-27 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2022-12-27 | Senate | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session |
2022-04-21 | Senate | Read; and referred to the committee on Senate Rules |
2022-04-19 | House | Read third and passed to be engrossed |
2021-12-23 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2021-12-23 | House | Rules suspended |
2021-12-23 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting |
2021-12-13 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee as changed and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2021-12-13 | House | Accompanied by S1321 |
2021-10-08 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 10/19/2021 from 11:00 AM-03:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2021-03-29 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Municipalities and Regional Government |
Same As/Similar To
S1321 (Similar To) 2021-12-13 - Accompanied H2150
H3768 (Similar To) 2021-07-26 - Amended by substitution of a bill with the same title, H3996
H3751 (Similar To) 2022-07-28 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 119 of the Acts of 2022
H3972 (Similar To) 2021-09-14 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 49 of the Acts of 2021
H3996 (Similar To) 2022-02-03 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 19 of the Acts of 2022
H4098 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H4104 (Similar To) 2022-01-26 - Amended by substitution of a bill with the same title, see H4360
H3346 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S524 (Similar To) 2021-06-09 - Accompanied H851
S1357 (Similar To) 2022-05-16 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 58 of the Acts of 2022
S1359 (Similar To) 2022-01-31 - Accompanied a study order, see S2630
H3196 (Similar To) 2022-09-08 - Accompanied a study order, see H5256
H2944 (Similar To) 2022-08-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H5043
S1060 (Similar To) 2022-04-19 - Accompanied a study order, see S2838
S154 (Similar To) 2022-02-22 - Accompanied a study order, see S2709
S2174 (Similar To) 2022-08-08 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
H5096 (Similar To) 2022-07-26 - Read third and passed to be engrossed
H5144 (Similar To) 2022-07-30 - Text of an amendment, see S3004
H3768 (Similar To) 2021-07-26 - Amended by substitution of a bill with the same title, H3996
H3751 (Similar To) 2022-07-28 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 119 of the Acts of 2022
H3972 (Similar To) 2021-09-14 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 49 of the Acts of 2021
H3996 (Similar To) 2022-02-03 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 19 of the Acts of 2022
H4098 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H4104 (Similar To) 2022-01-26 - Amended by substitution of a bill with the same title, see H4360
H3346 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S524 (Similar To) 2021-06-09 - Accompanied H851
S1357 (Similar To) 2022-05-16 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 58 of the Acts of 2022
S1359 (Similar To) 2022-01-31 - Accompanied a study order, see S2630
H3196 (Similar To) 2022-09-08 - Accompanied a study order, see H5256
H2944 (Similar To) 2022-08-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H5043
S1060 (Similar To) 2022-04-19 - Accompanied a study order, see S2838
S154 (Similar To) 2022-02-22 - Accompanied a study order, see S2709
S2174 (Similar To) 2022-08-08 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
H5096 (Similar To) 2022-07-26 - Read third and passed to be engrossed
H5144 (Similar To) 2022-07-30 - Text of an amendment, see S3004
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H2150 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H2150.pdf |