MA H2148 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 23-1)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-12-16 - Accompanied S1322
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-12-16 - Accompanied S1322
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to the business of operating a commercial boarding or training kennels or commercial breeder kennels. Municipalities and Regional Government.
Title
Protecting the health and safety of puppies and kittens in cities and towns
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-12-16 | Senate | Accompanied S1322 |
2021-09-21 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 09/28/2021 from 12:00 PM-03:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2021-03-29 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Municipalities and Regional Government |
Same As/Similar To
S1322 (Similar To) 2022-07-11 - New draft substituted, see S2994
H3868 (Similar To) 2022-09-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H5240
H2224 (Similar To) 2021-12-02 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4273
H3640 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H3099 (Similar To) 2022-09-15 - Accompanied a study order, see H4856
S1392 (Similar To) 2022-02-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2692
S273 (Similar To) 2022-03-03 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2994 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H5137 (Similar To) 2022-08-08 - Read; and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
H3868 (Similar To) 2022-09-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H5240
H2224 (Similar To) 2021-12-02 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4273
H3640 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H3099 (Similar To) 2022-09-15 - Accompanied a study order, see H4856
S1392 (Similar To) 2022-02-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2692
S273 (Similar To) 2022-03-03 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2994 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H5137 (Similar To) 2022-08-08 - Read; and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H2148 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H2148.pdf |