MA H2116 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H5281
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-0)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-09-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H5281
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-09-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H5281
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to provide access to full spectrum addiction treatment services. Mental Health, Substance Use and Recovery.
Title
Providing access to full spectrum addiction treatment services
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-09-22 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H5281 |
2022-06-08 | House | Reported favorably by committee and referred to the Joint Committee on Health Care Financing |
2022-06-02 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2022-06-02 | House | Reporting date extended to Thursday June 2, 2022, pending concurrence |
2022-05-26 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2022-05-12 | House | Reporting date extended to Tuesday May 31, 2022, pending concurrence |
2022-03-24 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2022-02-09 | House | Reporting date extended to Monday May 9, 2022, pending concurrence |
2021-09-08 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 10/04/2021 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2021-03-29 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Mental Health, Substance Use and Recovery |
Same As/Similar To
S1292 (Similar To) 2022-09-08 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
H5281 (Replaced by) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H5281 (Replaced by) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H2116 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H2116.pdf |