MA H2073 | 2011-2012 | 187th General Court
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 6 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-08-06 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 220 of the Acts of 2012
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 6 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-08-06 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 220 of the Acts of 2012
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to creation of a reserve fund for credit unions. Financial Services.
Title
Relative to creation of a reserve fund for credit unions
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-08-06 | Signed by the Governor, Chapter 220 of the Acts of 2012 | |
2012-07-31 | Senate | Enacted and laid before the Governor |
2012-07-31 | House | Enacted |
2012-07-31 | Senate | Read, rules suspended, read second, ordered to a third reading, read third and passed to be engrossed |
2012-07-25 | House | Read third (title changed) and passed to be engrossed |
2012-05-30 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2012-05-29 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting for a second reading |
2012-05-07 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the House committee on Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2012-01-26 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 02/07/2012 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in A-2 |
2011-01-24 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2011-01-24 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Financial Services |
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/187/House/H2073 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/PDF?billId=14317&generalCourtId=1 |