MA H2058 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H5023
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-09-06 - Accompanied a study order, see H5023
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-09-06 - Accompanied a study order, see H5023
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to an eight hour work day. Labor and Workforce Development.
Title
Relative to an eight hour work day
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-09-06 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H5023 |
2021-10-05 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 10/19/2021 from 10:30 AM-04:30 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2021-03-29 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Labor and Workforce Development |
Same As/Similar To
S2061 (Similar To) 2021-12-27 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1068 (Similar To) 2022-02-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2665
S2410 (Similar To) 2022-02-14 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2409 (Similar To) 2022-02-14 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H2362 (Similar To) 2022-06-09 - Accompanied S1399
H3114 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H2582 (Similar To) 2022-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see H4960
H2014 (Similar To) 2022-09-01 - Accompanied a study order, see H5233
H2224 (Similar To) 2021-12-02 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4273
H561 (Similar To) 2022-08-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H5136
S1703 (Similar To) 2022-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see S2679
S1603 (Similar To) 2022-03-17 - Accompanied a study order, see S2766
H2588 (Similar To) 2022-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see H4960
S1230 (Similar To) 2022-02-24 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2087 (Similar To) 2022-01-24 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1170 (Similar To) 2022-04-07 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1089 (Similar To) 2022-02-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2665
S927 (Similar To) 2022-02-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2665
S1160 (Similar To) 2022-02-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2691
S1159 (Similar To) 2022-03-03 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H5023 (Replaced by) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H2549 (Similar To) 2022-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see H4960
S1068 (Similar To) 2022-02-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2665
S2410 (Similar To) 2022-02-14 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2409 (Similar To) 2022-02-14 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H2362 (Similar To) 2022-06-09 - Accompanied S1399
H3114 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H2582 (Similar To) 2022-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see H4960
H2014 (Similar To) 2022-09-01 - Accompanied a study order, see H5233
H2224 (Similar To) 2021-12-02 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4273
H561 (Similar To) 2022-08-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H5136
S1703 (Similar To) 2022-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see S2679
S1603 (Similar To) 2022-03-17 - Accompanied a study order, see S2766
H2588 (Similar To) 2022-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see H4960
S1230 (Similar To) 2022-02-24 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2087 (Similar To) 2022-01-24 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1170 (Similar To) 2022-04-07 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1089 (Similar To) 2022-02-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2665
S927 (Similar To) 2022-02-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2665
S1160 (Similar To) 2022-02-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2691
S1159 (Similar To) 2022-03-03 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H5023 (Replaced by) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H2549 (Similar To) 2022-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see H4960
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H2058 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H2058.pdf |