MA H2035 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to establishing an interscholastic athletic competition working group. Education.
Title
Establishing an interscholastic athletic competition working group
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-01 | House | No further action taken |
2017-05-22 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means |
2017-04-10 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 04/13/2017 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-2 |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2017-01-23 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Education |
Same As/Similar To
H2059 (Similar To) 2018-07-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H4685
H2863 (Similar To) 2018-07-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4716
H254 (Similar To) 2018-07-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4716
H2863 (Similar To) 2018-07-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4716
H254 (Similar To) 2018-07-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4716
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H2035 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H2035.pdf |