MA H1996 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court

Note: Legislation replaced by H1984

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-04 - Accompanied H1984
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation to establish a program to address maternal mental health conditions and substance use disorders of certain pregnant and postpartum individuals. Mental Health, Substance Use and Recovery.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establishing a maternal mental health equity grant program

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2024-03-04HouseAccompanied H1984
2023-09-24JointHearing scheduled for 10/02/2023 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-1
2023-02-16SenateSenate concurred
2023-02-16HouseReferred to the Joint Committee on Mental Health, Substance Use and Recovery

Same As/Similar To

H1984 (Replaced by) 2024-04-11 - Senate concurred
S2475 (Similar To) 2023-10-19 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2473 (Similar To) 2023-10-19 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
H4142 (Similar To) 2024-06-06 - Accompanied a study order, see H4713
H4647 (Similar To) 2024-06-13 - Adopted, in concurrence

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback