MA H1980 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-11 - Senate concurred
Pending: Joint Mental Health, Substance Abuse and Recovery Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-11 - Senate concurred
Pending: Joint Mental Health, Substance Abuse and Recovery Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to the involuntary hospitalization of individuals if no less restrictive alternatives exist to reduce the likelihood of serious harm by reason of mental illness. Mental Health, Substance Use and Recovery.
Title
Relative to ending unnecessary hospitalizations and reducing emergency department boarding
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-11 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2024-02-08 | House | Reporting date extended to Wednesday May 15, 2024, pending concurrence |
2023-10-26 | Joint | Hearing rescheduled to 10/30/2023 from 12:00 PM-05:00 PM in B-1 |
2023-10-26 | Joint | Hearing rescheduled to 10/30/2023 from 12:00 PM-05:00 PM in Gardner Auditorium |
2023-10-23 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 10/30/2023 from 12:00 PM-05:00 PM in Gardner Auditorium |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2023-02-16 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Mental Health, Substance Use and Recovery |
Same As/Similar To
S1235 (Similar To) 2024-02-12 - Accompanied a study order, see S2642
S610 (Similar To) 2024-04-08 - Committee recommended ought to pass and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H1993 (Similar To) 2023-10-26 - Hearing rescheduled to 10/30/2023 from 12:00 PM-05:00 PM in B-1
H989 (Similar To) 2024-04-08 - Accompanied S610
S610 (Similar To) 2024-04-08 - Committee recommended ought to pass and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H1993 (Similar To) 2023-10-26 - Hearing rescheduled to 10/30/2023 from 12:00 PM-05:00 PM in B-1
H989 (Similar To) 2024-04-08 - Accompanied S610
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H1980 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H1980.pdf |