MA H1970 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 57-14-1)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2022-02-24 - Accompanied S1217
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Relative to transparency in employee benefits reporting in private construction. Labor and Workforce Development.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to transparency in employee benefits reporting in private construction

Sponsors

Rep. Carolyn Dykema [D]Rep. Marcos Devers [D]Rep. Tami Gouveia [D]Rep. David DeCoste [R]
Rep. Marc Lombardo [R]Rep. Michael Kushmerek [D]Rep. David Linsky [D]Rep. William Pignatelli [D]
Rep. Timothy Whelan [R]Rep. Susannah Whipps Lee [I]Rep. David Muradian [R]Rep. John Barrett [D]
Rep. Angelo Puppolo [D]Rep. Richard Haggerty [D]Rep. Michael Soter [R]Rep. Kay Khan [D]
Rep. Kathleen LaNatra [D]Rep. Edward Coppinger [D]Rep. Susan Gifford [R]Rep. Mathew Muratore [R]
Rep. Steven Xiarhos [R]Rep. Brian Murray [D]Rep. Carmine Gentile [D]Rep. Christopher Markey [D]
Rep. James O'Day [D]Rep. Peter Capano [D]Rep. Thomas Walsh [D]Rep. Lindsay Sabadosa [D]
Rep. Michael Day [D]Rep. David Robertson [D]Rep. Christopher Hendricks [D]Rep. Kelly Pease [R]
Rep. Jessica Giannino [D]Rep. Paul Donato [D]Rep. Paul Mark [D]Rep. Kevin Honan [D]
Rep. James Murphy [D]Rep. Carlos Gonzalez [D]Rep. Rady Mom [D]Rep. Christina Minicucci [D]
Rep. Kate Lipper-Garabedian [D]Rep. Joseph McGonagle [D]Rep. David LeBoeuf [D]Rep. Lori Ehrlich [D]
Rep. Paul McMurtry [D]Rep. William Galvin [D]Rep. Maria Robinson [D]Sen. Diana DiZoglio [D]
Rep. Adam Scanlon [D]Rep. Bud Williams [D]Rep. Orlando Ramos [D]Rep. Kimberly Ferguson [R]
Rep. Gerard Cassidy [D]Rep. Andres Vargas [D]Rep. Sean Garballey [D]Rep. Jon Santiago [D]
Rep. Angelo D'Emilia [R]Sen. John Keenan [D]Rep. David Biele [D]Rep. Bradley Jones [R]
Rep. Tram Nguyen [D]Rep. Paul Tucker [D]Rep. Daniel Ryan [D]Rep. Steven Ultrino [D]
Rep. Tommy Vitolo [D]Rep. Hannah Kane [R]Rep. Ruth Balser [D]Rep. Norman Orrall [R]
Sen. James Eldridge [D]Rep. Michelle Ciccolo [D]Rep. Natalie Higgins [D]Rep. Erika Uyterhoeven [D]

History

DateChamberAction
2022-02-24SenateAccompanied S1217
2021-06-29JointHearing scheduled for 07/13/2021 from 10:30 AM-04:30 PM in Virtual Hearing
2021-03-29SenateSenate concurred
2021-03-29HouseReferred to the Joint Committee on Labor and Workforce Development

Same As/Similar To

S1217 (Similar To) 2022-02-24 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1156 (Similar To) 2022-03-03 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2722
S2205 (Similar To) 2022-02-24 - Accompanied a study order, see S2715
S1191 (Similar To) 2022-04-07 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2817

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback