MA H1959 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4681
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 120-5)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-11 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4681
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-11 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4681
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to prevent wage theft, promote employer accountability, and enhance public enforcement. Labor and Workforce Development.
Title
To prevent wage theft, promote employer accountability, and enhance public enforcement
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-11 | House | Accompanied a new draft, see H4681 |
2022-03-17 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2022-02-07 | House | Reporting date extended to Monday April 4, 2022, pending concurrence |
2021-05-25 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 06/08/2021 from 10:30 AM-02:30 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2021-03-29 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Labor and Workforce Development |
Same As/Similar To
S1179 (Similar To) 2022-04-11 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4681
S1251 (Similar To) 2022-04-11 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4681
S1143 (Similar To) 2022-02-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2665
H4681 (Replaced by) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S1251 (Similar To) 2022-04-11 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4681
S1143 (Similar To) 2022-02-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2665
H4681 (Replaced by) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H1959 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H1959.pdf |