MA H1957 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 46-0)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-03 - Accompanied S1165
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-03 - Accompanied S1165
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to develop a comprehensive strategic plan for reducing certified nursing assistant labor shortages. Labor and Workforce Development.
Title
To provide pathways for certified nursing assistants
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-03 | Senate | Accompanied S1165 |
2021-07-15 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 07/27/2021 from 10:30 AM-03:30 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2021-03-29 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Labor and Workforce Development |
Same As/Similar To
S1165 (Similar To) 2022-03-03 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S852 (Similar To) 2022-04-07 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2812
S2225 (Similar To) 2022-02-22 - Accompanied a study order, see S2711
H5128 (Similar To) 2022-08-03 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 138 of the Acts of 2022
S852 (Similar To) 2022-04-07 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2812
S2225 (Similar To) 2022-02-22 - Accompanied a study order, see S2711
H5128 (Similar To) 2022-08-03 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 138 of the Acts of 2022
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H1957 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H1957.pdf |