MA H1951 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court

Note: Legislation replaced by H4570

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-05-15 - Accompanied a study order, see H4570
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Relative to the structure of the Commonwealth Employment Relations Board. Labor and Workforce Development.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to the structure of the Commonwealth Employment Relations Board

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2024-05-15HouseAccompanied a study order, see H4570
2023-10-30JointHearing rescheduled to 11/14/2023 from 10:30 AM-01:30 PM in B-2
2023-10-30JointHearing scheduled for 11/14/2023 from 10:30 AM-01:30 PM in B-2
2023-02-16SenateSenate concurred
2023-02-16HouseReferred to the Joint Committee on Labor and Workforce Development

Same As/Similar To

S1223 (Similar To) 2024-03-28 - Senate concurred
H152 (Similar To) 2024-02-15 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4390
H4390 (Similar To) 2024-03-11 - Committee recommended ought to pass and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H4570 (Replaced by) 2024-05-15 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback