MA H1948 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 72-14)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-04-30 - Senate concurred
Pending: Joint Health Care Financing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation to establish a board of registration in midwifery and further regulating out-of-hospital birth access and safety. Public Health.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to out-of-hospital birth access and safety

Sponsors

Rep. Kay Khan [D]Sen. Rebecca Rausch [D]Rep. James Arciero [D]Rep. Ruth Balser [D]
Rep. Christine Barber [D]Rep. John Barrett [D]Rep. Jennifer Benson [D]Rep. Donald Berthiaume [R]
Rep. David Biele [D]Rep. Natalie Blais [D]Rep. Daniel Cahill [D]Rep. Daniel Carey [D]
Rep. Tackey Chan [D]Sen. Harriette Chandler [D]Rep. Mike Connolly [D]Rep. Daniel Cullinane [D]
Rep. Angelo D'Emilia [R]Rep. Marjorie Decker [D]Rep. Mindy Domb [D]Rep. Daniel Donahue [D]
Rep. Carolyn Dykema [D]Rep. Lori Ehrlich [D]Sen. James Eldridge [D]Rep. Nika Elugardo [D]
Rep. Kimberly Ferguson [R]Rep. Dylan Fernandes [D]Rep. Carole Fiola [D]Rep. Paul Frost [R]
Rep. Sean Garballey [D]Rep. Denise Garlick [D]Rep. Colleen Garry [D]Rep. Carmine Gentile [D]
Rep. Susan Gifford [R]Rep. Carlos Gonzalez [D]Rep. Kenneth Gordon [D]Rep. Tami Gouveia [D]
Rep. Richard Haggerty [D]Rep. Stephan Hay [D]Rep. Jonathan Hecht [D]Rep. Natalie Higgins [D]
Rep. Bradford Hill [R]Rep. Kevin Honan [D]Rep. Steven Howitt [R]Rep. Daniel Hunt [D]
Rep. Bradley Jones [R]Rep. Hannah Kane [R]Rep. Patrick Kearney [D]Rep. John Lawn [D]
Rep. David LeBoeuf [D]Rep. Jack Lewis [D]Sen. Jason Lewis [D]Rep. David Linsky [D]
Rep. Jay Livingstone [D]Rep. Adrian Madaro [D]Rep. Elizabeth Malia [D]Rep. Paul Mark [D]
Rep. Joseph McGonagle [D]Rep. Christina Minicucci [D]Rep. Liz Miranda [D]Rep. Leonard Mirra [R]
Rep. Michael Moran [D]Rep. Mathew Muratore [R]Rep. Brian Murray [D]Rep. Tram Nguyen [D]
Rep. James O'Day [D]Rep. Sarah Peake [D]Rep. William Pignatelli [D]Rep. Elizabeth Poirier [R]
Rep. Denise Provost [D]Rep. David Robertson [D]Rep. Maria Robinson [D]Rep. David Rogers [D]
Rep. Daniel Ryan [D]Rep. Lindsay Sabadosa [D]Rep. Jon Santiago [D]Rep. Todd Smola [R]
Rep. Michael Soter [R]Rep. Thomas Stanley [D]Rep. William Straus [D]Rep. Jose Tosado [D]
Rep. Paul Tucker [D]Rep. Steven Ultrino [D]Rep. Andres Vargas [D]Rep. Aaron Vega [D]
Rep. Tommy Vitolo [D]Rep. Bud Williams [D]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-04-30SenateSenate concurred
2020-04-29HouseReporting date extended to Friday June 19, 2020, pending concurrence
2020-03-26SenateSenate concurred
2020-03-23HouseReporting date extended to Friday May 1, 2020, pending concurrence
2019-12-26HouseReported favorably by committee and referred to the Joint Committee on Health Care Financing
2019-05-20JointHearing scheduled for 05/28/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2
2019-01-22SenateSenate concurred
2019-01-22HouseReferred to the Joint Committee on Public Health

Same As/Similar To

S1332 (Similar To) 2020-04-30 - Senate concurred

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback