MA H1944 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-10-01 - Hearing scheduled for 10/08/2019 from 12:00 PM-04:00 PM in 428
Pending: Joint Health Care Financing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Relative to participation in the national nurse licensure compact agreement. Public Health.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to nurse licensure compact in Massachusetts

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-10-01JointHearing scheduled for 10/08/2019 from 12:00 PM-04:00 PM in 428
2019-08-15SenateSenate concurred
2019-08-01HouseDischarged to the Joint Committee on Health Care Financing
2019-01-22SenateSenate concurred
2019-01-22HouseReferred to the Joint Committee on Public Health

Same As/Similar To

S103 (Similar To) 2019-05-07 - Hearing scheduled for 05/13/2019 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in A-2

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback