MA H1924 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court

Note: Legislation replaced by H5014

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 42-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-09-05 - Accompanied a study order, see H5014
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation to promote the recruitment and retention of hospital workers. Labor and Workforce Development.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To promote the recruitment and retention of hospital workers

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2024-09-05HouseAccompanied a study order, see H5014
2024-04-11SenateSenate concurred
2024-03-28HouseReporting date extended to Wednesday July 3, 2024, pending concurrence
2024-01-25HouseReported favorably by committee and referred to the Joint Committee on Health Care Financing
2024-01-25HouseAccompanied by S1154
2023-07-06JointHearing scheduled for 07/18/2023 from 10:30 AM-01:00 PM in A-1
2023-02-16SenateSenate concurred
2023-02-16HouseReferred to the Joint Committee on Labor and Workforce Development

Same As/Similar To

S1154 (Similar To) 2024-01-25 - Accompanied H1924
H1881 (Similar To) 2024-09-05 - Accompanied a study order, see H5014
H5014 (Replaced by) 2024-12-31 - No further action taken

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback