MA H1923 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court

Note: Legislation replaced by H4570

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-05-15 - Accompanied a study order, see H4570
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation to establish a special commission (including members of the General Court) to determine ways to best connect unemployed workers with job openings. Labor and Workforce Development.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To study a revenue neutral guaranteed jobs program

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2024-05-15HouseAccompanied a study order, see H4570
2023-07-06JointHearing scheduled for 07/18/2023 from 10:30 AM-01:00 PM in A-1
2023-02-16SenateSenate concurred
2023-02-16HouseReferred to the Joint Committee on Labor and Workforce Development

Same As/Similar To

H4570 (Replaced by) 2024-05-15 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback