MA H1916 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 72-7)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-04-30 - Senate concurred
Pending: Joint Health Care Financing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation to expand patient access to oral health care. Public Health.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To improve oral health for all Massachusetts residents

Sponsors

Rep. Kate Hogan [D]Rep. William Pignatelli [D]Rep. Bradley Jones [R]Rep. Christine Barber [D]
Rep. Jose Tosado [D]Rep. Bud Williams [D]Rep. Antonio Cabral [D]Rep. Timothy Whelan [R]
Rep. Angelo Puppolo [D]Rep. Brian Ashe [D]Sen. Diana DiZoglio [D]Rep. Josh Cutler [D]
Rep. Carlos Gonzalez [D]Rep. David Linsky [D]Rep. Ann-Margaret Ferrante [D]Rep. Steven Ultrino [D]
Rep. John Barrett [D]Sen. Adam Hinds [D]Rep. Louis Kafka [D]Rep. Mike Connolly [D]
Sen. Harriette Chandler [D]Rep. Donald Wong [R]Rep. Carmine Gentile [D]Rep. Natalie Blais [D]
Rep. Marjorie Decker [D]Rep. Kevin Honan [D]Rep. Patrick Kearney [D]Rep. Mark Cusack [D]
Rep. David Rogers [D]Rep. Denise Garlick [D]Rep. Natalie Higgins [D]Rep. James O'Day [D]
Rep. Denise Provost [D]Rep. Maria Robinson [D]Sen. Marc Pacheco [D]Sen. Michael Moore [D]
Rep. Elizabeth Malia [D]Sen. Rebecca Rausch [D]Rep. Kay Khan [D]Rep. John Lawn [D]
Rep. Marcos Devers [D]Rep. Paul Mark [D]Rep. Michael Finn [D]Rep. Daniel Donahue [D]
Sen. James Eldridge [D]Rep. Mathew Muratore [R]Rep. Mary Keefe [D]Rep. Daniel Hunt [D]
Sen. Brendan Crighton [D]Rep. Tami Gouveia [D]Rep. Carole Fiola [D]Rep. Paul McMurtry [D]
Sen. Michael Brady [D]Rep. David LeBoeuf [D]Rep. Tricia Farley-Bouvier [D]Rep. Todd Smola [R]
Rep. Jack Lewis [D]Rep. James Arciero [D]Rep. Adrian Madaro [D]Rep. Mindy Domb [D]
Rep. Christina Minicucci [D]Rep. Kenneth Gordon [D]Rep. John Rogers [D]Rep. Alice Peisch [D]
Rep. Elizabeth Poirier [R]Rep. John Velis [D]Rep. Liz Miranda [D]Sen. Bruce Tarr [R]
Rep. Jonathan Hecht [D]Rep. Linda Campbell [D]Rep. Edward Coppinger [D]Rep. Paul Brodeur [D]
Rep. Michelle Ciccolo [D]Rep. Sean Garballey [D]Rep. Bruce Ayers [D]Rep. Thomas Walsh [D]
Rep. Frank Moran [D]Rep. Roselee Vincent [D]Rep. James Hawkins [D]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-04-30SenateSenate concurred
2020-04-29HouseReporting date extended to Friday June 19, 2020, pending concurrence
2020-03-26SenateSenate concurred
2020-03-23HouseReporting date extended to Friday May 1, 2020, pending concurrence
2019-08-15SenateSenate concurred
2019-08-01HouseDischarged to the Joint Committee on Health Care Financing
2019-04-30JointHearing scheduled for 05/07/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in B-1
2019-01-22SenateSenate concurred
2019-01-22HouseReferred to the Joint Committee on Public Health

Same As/Similar To

H1933 (Similar To) 2019-11-19 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4211
H1891 (Similar To) 2020-02-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4449
S713 (Similar To) 2020-04-30 - Senate concurred
S1239 (Similar To) 2020-03-26 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2614
H1850 (Similar To) 2020-04-23 - Senate concurred

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback