MA H1894 | 2011-2012 | 187th General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-01-01 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-01-01 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to exempting certain school stadiums from plumbing regulations. Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure.
Title
Exempting certain stadiums from plumbing regulations
Sponsors
Rep. Jerald Parisella [D] | Sen. Jason Lewis [D] | Rep. Chris Walsh [D] | Sen. James Timilty [D] |
Rep. Michael Finn [D] | Rep. James Dwyer [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-01-01 | House | No further action taken |
2012-10-30 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2012-04-17 | House | Discharged to the Joint Committee on Public Health |
2012-03-15 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the House committee on Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2011-05-13 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 05/17/2011 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in A-1 |
2011-01-24 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2011-01-24 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure |
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/187/House/H1894 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/PDF?billId=8924&generalCourtId=1 |