MA H1892 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-05-09 - Reporting date extended to Wednesday July 31, 2024, pending concurrence
Pending: Joint Labor and Workforce Development Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Relative to anti-retaliation protections for public employees. Labor and Workforce Development.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to anti-retaliation protections for public employees

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2024-05-09HouseReporting date extended to Wednesday July 31, 2024, pending concurrence
2024-03-28SenateSenate concurred
2024-02-12HouseReporting date extended to Wednesday May 8, 2024, pending concurrence
2023-09-29JointHearing scheduled for 10/10/2023 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in A-1
2023-02-16SenateSenate concurred
2023-02-16HouseReferred to the Joint Committee on Labor and Workforce Development

Same As/Similar To

H48 (Similar To) 2024-04-04 - Accompanied a study order, see H4518
S2540 (Similar To) 2024-02-08 - Accompanied a study order, see S2610
H4626 (Similar To) 2024-06-12 - New draft substituted, see H4746
H4746 (Similar To) 2024-07-22 - Placed in the Orders of the Day for Wednesday, July 24, 2024

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback