MA H1892 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 30-13)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-02-18 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Relative to access to original birth certificates to persons born in the Commonwealth. Public Health.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Granting equal access to original birth certificates to all persons born in Massachusetts

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-18HouseRead second and ordered to a third reading
2020-02-18HouseRules suspended
2020-02-18HouseCommittee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting
2020-02-13HouseBill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling
2019-12-02JointHearing scheduled for 12/10/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2
2019-01-22SenateSenate concurred
2019-01-22HouseReferred to the Joint Committee on Public Health

Same As/Similar To

H726 (Similar To) 2020-02-13 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H1988 (Similar To) 2019-12-02 - Hearing scheduled for 12/10/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2
H1705 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a study order, see H4450
H1492 (Similar To) 2020-02-03 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling
S728 (Similar To) 2019-03-27 - Hearing scheduled for 04/11/2019 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in A-1
S304 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2538
S1936 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a study order, see S2552
H1002 (Similar To) 2019-09-18 - Hearing scheduled for 10/01/2019 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in A-2
S151 (Similar To) 2020-01-21 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4298
S640 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2543
S1308 (Similar To) 2019-06-27 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2278
H747 (Similar To) 2019-10-07 - Hearing scheduled for 10/15/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2
H741 (Similar To) 2019-04-30 - Hearing scheduled for 05/07/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2
S2278 (Similar To) 2019-07-25 - New draft substituted, see S2296
S2296 (Similar To) 2019-07-29 - Read; and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H4017 (Similar To) 2019-10-07 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 82 of the Acts of 2019

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback