MA H1882 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4844
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 12-5)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4844
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4844
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to protecting domestic violence victims. The Judiciary.
Title
Relative to protecting domestic violence victims
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-09 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4844 |
2021-11-30 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 12/07/2021 from 10:00 AM-02:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2021-03-29 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on The Judiciary |
Same As/Similar To
S190 (Similar To) 2022-02-10 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2678
H2023 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S1076 (Similar To) 2022-02-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2665
H1730 (Similar To) 2022-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4844
H1753 (Similar To) 2022-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4844
S1023 (Similar To) 2022-02-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2665
H1642 (Similar To) 2022-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4844
H3694 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S176 (Similar To) 2022-02-10 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2678
S702 (Similar To) 2022-04-04 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H4844 (Replaced by) 2022-06-09 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
H1919 (Similar To) 2022-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4844
H2023 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S1076 (Similar To) 2022-02-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2665
H1730 (Similar To) 2022-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4844
H1753 (Similar To) 2022-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4844
S1023 (Similar To) 2022-02-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2665
H1642 (Similar To) 2022-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4844
H3694 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S176 (Similar To) 2022-02-10 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2678
S702 (Similar To) 2022-04-04 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H4844 (Replaced by) 2022-06-09 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
H1919 (Similar To) 2022-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4844
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H1882 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H1882.pdf |